Micieli, Jonathan Andrew (CPSO#: 97942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 501
340 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-1335
Fax: (416) 928-5075
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Eye Specialists & Surgeons
Suite 301
801 Eglinton Ave. W
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: (647) 748-8377
Fax: (416) 619-5539
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital
61 Queen St East, 8th floor
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ANDREW MICIELI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICIELI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2018