Middaugh, Jeffrey Arthur (CPSO#: 92229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4790
Fax: (705) 675-4794
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 McKinnon Dr
Espanola, On
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey A. Middaugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Middaugh ( CPSO# 92229 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ARTHUR MIDDAUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDAUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 19 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011