Midha, Vishal Manohar (CPSO#: 92346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Shivaji University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markington FamilyCare & Walk In
3227 Eglinton Avenue East
Unit 143-144
Scarborough ON  M1J 3M5
Phone: (416) 261 4446
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Midha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Midha ( CPSO# 92346 )

Business Address:
Brampton East Medical Centre
Suite 1
4525 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 794-2003

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vishal  Manohar  Midha  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine, only.