Midzic, Ines (CPSO#: 91462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81855
Fax: (613) 738-8488
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ines Midzic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Midzic ( CPSO# 91462 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital- Riverside
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INES MIDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDZIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014