Migicovsky, Valerie Rachel (CPSO#: 93273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Dundas Medical Clinic
530 Fred Street, Suite E
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: 6137742420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie Migicovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Migicovsky ( CPSO# 93273 )

Business Address:
North Dundas Medical Clinic
530 Fred Street
Suite E
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 239-2165

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE RACHEL MIGICOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGICOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012