Mik, Helene Marienne Danielle (CPSO#: 88700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto, ON
M3M 0B2
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43000
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

102-60 West Drive
Brampton ON  L6T 3T6
Canada
Phone: 9054592282
Fax: 9054592290
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENE MARIENNE DANIELLE MIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013