Mikail, Azza Makram (CPSO#: 81384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A2
3980 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Phone: (905) 615-0107
Fax: (905) 615-1711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Makram Mikail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikail ( CPSO# 81384 )

Business Address:
A2 - 3980 Grant Park Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Phone Number: (905) 615-0107

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZZA MAKRAM MIKAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006