Mikhael, Dalia (CPSO#: 81080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
224 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Phone: (613) 248-1010
Fax: (613) 248-1019
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Mikhael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mikhael ( CPSO# 81080 )

Business Address:
224 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Phone Number: (613) 248-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA MIKHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010