Mikhael, Rafeek (CPSO#: 86399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: Fathy Mikhael, Rafeek Refaat Abdallah (used until: 16 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFEEK MIKHAEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MIKHAEL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MIKHAEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MIKHAEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MIKHAEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MIKHAEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MIKHAEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019