Mikhail, Eric (CPSO#: 93646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mikhail ( CPSO# 93646 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015