Mikhail, Maged Aziz Anis (CPSO#: 70819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1527 Eagle Mountain Drive
Coquitlam BC  V3E 2Z3
Phone: (604) 552-7455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGED AZIZ ANIS MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 1996 to 20 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1999