Mikhail, Mamdouh Talaat Shoukry (CPSO#: 84842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit C2
9418 Markham Road (HWY 48)
Markham ON  L6E 0N1
Phone: (905) 554-9155
Fax: (905) 554-9156
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mamdouh Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mikhail ( CPSO# 84842 )

Business Address:
Mount Joy Medical Centre
9418 Markham Road
Unit #C2
Markham ON  L6E 0N1
Phone Number: (905) 554-9155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAMDOUH TALAAT SHOUKRY MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008