Miklea, Jonel (CPSO#: 74036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian, Serbian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice Unit
3rd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone: (905) 546-9885
Fax: (905) 972-8903
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kam Miklea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Miklea ( CPSO# 74036 )
Dr. A. Kam ( CPSO# 79077 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
McMaster Family Practice Unit
3rd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Business Address:
HHS-McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
Room HSC 2N49
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONEL MIKLEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKLEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001