Mikrogianakis, Angelo (CPSO#: 71314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO MIKROGIANAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKROGIANAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018