Miladinovic, Mirko (CPSO#: 74579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6367
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 International Bulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Miladinovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miladinovic ( CPSO# 74579 )

Business Address:
Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6367

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bermuda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRKO MILADINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILADINOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001