Milani, Ali Reza (CPSO#: 80080)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 Cheadle Street West
Swift Current SK  S9H 4G3
Phone: (306) 778-5280

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 24 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2006