Miletic, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 51200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sarnia Aging Clinic
508 - 265 Front St N
Sarnia ON  N7T 5S6
Phone: (519) 491-6091
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH MILETIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILETIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2018