Milev, Roumen Vassilev (CPSO#: 76840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care
Mental Health Services
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 548-5567 Ext. 5402
Fax: (613) 540-6114
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roumen Milev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milev ( CPSO# 76840 )

Business Address:
Providence Care - Mental Health Services
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Adil Al-Mousawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016


Corporation Name: Yuhuan Xie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROUMEN VASSILEV MILEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILEV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001