Millar, David Ross (CPSO#: 71692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 17
99 Fifth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 104
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Canada
Phone: 613 691 2578
Fax: 613 226 7059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Canada
Phone: 613 627 0795
Fax: 613 226 7059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Millar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Millar ( CPSO# 71692 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 627-0795

Business Address:
104 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 691-2578

Business Address:
17 - 99 Fifth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone Number: (613) 563-3670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1999