Miller, Elizabeth Clarke (CPSO#: 97835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
B309
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Miller ( CPSO# 51202 )
Dr. E. Miller ( CPSO# 97835 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
CCW 1411
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187


Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller ( CPSO# 97835 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLARKE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2018