Miller, Elka (CPSO#: 85118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 14 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2303
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elka Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller ( CPSO# 85118 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELKA MILLER may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. MILLER holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. MILLER may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MILLER no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. MILLER no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. MILLER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015