Miller, James Edgar Buchanan (CPSO#: 19731)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Edgar Buchanan Miller to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 12, 2017:

Dr. Miller has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.