Miller, Mark Lee (CPSO#: 58079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2121 Main Street North
Jarvis ON  N0A 1J0
Phone: (519) 587-5201
Fax: (519) 587-5891
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 15, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mark Lee Miller, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Miller to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MARK LEE MILLER
                                          ("Dr. Miller") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Miller, certificate of registration number 58079, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that I signed an Undertaking to the College on
                  September 17, 2015 which included a term of clinical supervision,
                  followed by a reassessment of my practice. I farther acknowledge that the
                  reassessment of my practice, pursuant to the Undertaking, was conducted
                  and that the College received a report of that reassessment on May 2,
                  2018.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at  minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan "IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B".

                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, bi-weekly for the first three (3)
                              months, and monthly for the remaining nine (9) months;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first three (3) months, and quarterly for the
                              remaining nine (9) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B'', as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the final report of the assessor
                        who conducted the reassessment of my practice, and concerns that
                        may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I " 11 cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B'', including all of the self-study and professional
                        education set out in the IEP (the "Professional Education") and any
                        additional professional education recommended by my Clinical
                        Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Miller, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Miller, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that I have read and understand the prov1s10ns
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff').

            (13)  I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that, during the time pe1iod that this
                        Unde1iaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College conducted an assessment of Dr. Miller's practice. As a
                        result of the assessment:
                  
                              Dr. Miller will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
                  
                              Dr. Miller's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Miller, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Miller, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Miller, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Miller, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk ofham1 to my patients.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 4, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Miller  guilty of professional misconduct as 
 defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, as an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee therefore ordered and 
 directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend  Dr. Miller(s certificate of registration for six (6) 
 months asuspend the effect of this part of the order indefinitely if Dr. Miller successfully 
 completes the College(s record-keeping and communications courses at his own expense by February 
 15, 2003 and makes the costs payment within 30 days of this date and otherwise to impose the 
 suspension on February 15, 2003.

2.	Dr. Miller pay part of the College(s costs incurred in 
 conducting the hearing, fixed in the amount of $500 payable within 30 days of this date.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 04, 2002

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mark Lee Miller to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 15, 2018:

Dr. Miller will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Miller's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of April 3, 2018: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)