Milliken, Heather Isabel (CPSO#: 66735)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Ottawa Hospital 1145 Carling Ave Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018