Mills, Carol Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Potter, Carol Elizabeth (used until: 07 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medicine Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mills ( CPSO# 84337 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ELIZABETH MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009