Millward, Steven Frank (CPSO#: 54715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Realtime Medical
3rd Floor
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga ON  L5B 8C3
Phone: (905) 362-0223
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Steven Millward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )

Business Address:
7111 Syntex Drive
3rd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 362-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN FRANK MILLWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLWARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985