Milot, Laurent (CPSO#: 86997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7418
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Laurent Milot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Laurent Milot may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Milot  holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Milot  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.