Milrod, Elise Gabrielle (CPSO#: 72220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone: (519) 253-6033
Fax: (519) 253-6866
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Polsky and Milrod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Polsky ( CPSO# 70347 )
Dr. E. Milrod ( CPSO# 72220 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 253-6033

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISE GABRIELLE MILROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILROD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000