Miner, Steven Edward Stuart (CPSO#: 66789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miner and Nield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nield ( CPSO# 71563 )
Dr. S. Miner ( CPSO# 66789 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
641 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 898-5800

Business Address:
Division of Cardiology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6141

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 15 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN EDWARD STUART MINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1998