Mineyko, Aleksandra Hanna (CPSO#: 82617)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010