Minhas, Shikha (CPSO#: 75184)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2003 to 27 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2004