Minkovich, Leonid Leizarovich (CPSO#: 80101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Perm State Medical Academy, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton North Wing 3-410
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leonid Minkovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Minkovich ( CPSO# 80101 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Eaton North Wing 3-410
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Leonid  Leizarovich  Minkovich  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.