Minnema, Brian James (CPSO#: 82956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Room GW 33
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6130
Fax: (416) 756-6449
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian James Minnema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Minnema ( CPSO# 82956 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GW-33
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES MINNEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINNEMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010