Minnis, Shantel Monique (CPSO#: 78510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shantel Minnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKinney ( CPSO# 78659 )
Dr. S. Minnis ( CPSO# 78510 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin McKinney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKinney ( CPSO# 78659 )
Dr. S. Minnis ( CPSO# 78510 )

Business Address:
101A - 40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 744-2221

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahamas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANTEL MONIQUE MINNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 02 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010