Minorgan, Stephanie (CPSO#: 76223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Minorgan ( CPSO# 76223 )
Dr. R. Maranda ( CPSO# 76313 )

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 749-5421

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MINORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003