Mir Ghassemi, Asadollah (CPSO#: 95204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston general hospital
Department of anethesiology
76 Stuart street, Victory 2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 5487827
Fax: (613) 5481375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Mir Ghassemi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASADOLLAH MIR GHASSEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR GHASSEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016