Mirander, Lennox George (CPSO#: 91223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Burlington Family Health Team
103 - 1221 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington, Ontario
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lennox Mirander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mirander ( CPSO# 91223 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LENNOX GEORGE MIRANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012