Mireskandari, Kamiar (CPSO#: 89493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Leeds, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7403
Fax: (416) 813-8266
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mireskandari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mireskandari ( CPSO# 89493 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8375

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Kamiar Mireskandari may practise medicine independently in Ophthalmology.