Mirham, Lorna (CPSO#: 95381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: Mirham, Lorna Magdi Lamei Khalil (used until: 31 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie street
North York General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416 993 7963
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNA MIRHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016