Miron, Dominique (CPSO#: 95865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Medical St Isidore
4553 rue Ste Catherine
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone: (613) 524-3225
Fax: 613-524-2513
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Chemin Montreal
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE MIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014