Miropolsky, Vladislav (CPSO#: 88668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronoation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2249
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Miropolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Miropolsky ( CPSO# 88668 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VLADISLAV MIROPOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIROPOLSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009