Mirsattari, Seyed Mohammad (CPSO#: 72937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Turkish

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences - LHSC
University Campus, Room B10 - 106
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3348
Fax: (519) 663-3440
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5470
Fax: (519) 464-4564
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-4752
Fax: (705) 675-4796
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirsattari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mirsattari ( CPSO# 72937 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
Department of Clinical Neurology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
B10-106 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3348

Business Address:
Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
1st Floor, South Tower
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4793

Business Address:
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 566-4282

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED MOHAMMAD MIRSATTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRSATTARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 18 Nov 1998
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 1998 to 16 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 1998 to 13 Jan 1999
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 1999 to 10 Feb 1999
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Feb 1999 to 24 Mar 1999
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2000