Mirza, Faisal Mohammed (CPSO#: 69294)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2010