Mirzaei, Ameneh (CPSO#: 81230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road, Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: 613-680-8777
Fax: 613-680-8599
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. E. Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mirzaei ( CPSO# 81230 )
Dr. C. E ( CPSO# 66813 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700


Corporation Name: Ameneh Mirzaei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mirzaei ( CPSO# 81230 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental
Health Care Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMENEH MIRZAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 29 Apr 2008 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011