Mishkel, Gregory Jon (CPSO#: 51211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prairie Cardiovascular Center
P O Box 19420
Springfield IL  62794
United States
Phone: (217) 788-0706
Fax: (217) 525-2799

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JON MISHKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHKEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1984