Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Paul Missiuna was charged with the following offences:
1. Sexual Assault, on or between April 9, 1994 and December 31, 2005, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code.
2. Sexual Interference with a person under 16 years old, on or between April 9, 1994 and April 8, 2005, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code.
3. Invitation to Sexual Touching to a person under 16 years old, on or between April 9, 1997 and April 8, 1998, contrary to section 152 of the Criminal Code.
4. Sexual Exploitation of a young person, on or between April 9, 2005 and December 31, 2005, contrary to section 153(1.1) of the Criminal Code.
5. Making child pornography, on or between April 9, 1994 and April 8, 1996, contrary to Section 163.1(2) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: August 31, 2022, updated November 8, 2022
Place of Charge: Hamilton, Ontario
Hamilton Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 12, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 31, 2022 (varied September 13, 2022), the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Paul Missiuna:
1. Missiuna must notify named police officer of any change of employment or address within 48 hours.
2. Missiuna must not communicate directly or indirectly with two named persons.
3. Missiuna must not be within 100 metres of any known place of residence, worship, education, or recreation of two named persons.
4. Missiuna must not be in the presence of any child under the age of 16 unless accompanied by an adult.
5. Missiuna must not engage in any volunteer activities or employment that involve being in a position of trust or authority towards any person under the age of 16 unless accompanied by an adult.