Mitchell, Doris Lynn (CPSO#: 93615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Foxlake Rd
Chapleau Cree First Nation
Chapleau, ON
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone: (705) 860-6000
Fax: (705) 860-6001
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chapleau Health Services
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 864-1520
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doris Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mitchell ( CPSO# 93615 )

Business Address:
800 Foxlake Road
Chapleau Cree First Nation
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 860-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS LYNN MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012