Mitchell, Nadine Claudia (CPSO#: 88472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: 519-272-2040
Fax: 519-272-2323
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Department of Paediatrics
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 519-272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Qikiqtani General Hospital
Niaqunngusiariaq
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mitchell ( CPSO# 88472 )

Business Address:
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Department of Paediatrics
46 General Hospital Drive
Perth ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Algoma Mills ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Niaqunngusiariaq
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone Number: (867) 975-8600

Business Address:
Jenny Trout Centre
113 - 342 Erie Street
Perth ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE CLAUDIA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 19 Aug 2011 to 18 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012