Mitchell, Robert Alfred (CPSO#: 108628)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 08 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2018 to 20 Aug 2018
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2018