Mittal, Charu (CPSO#: 74983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
Department of Radiology
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 33289
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARU MITTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005